Licence Number | Applicant Name | Issued | Commences | Expires |
---|---|---|---|---|
LD0367 | LANE Jamie Francis | 04/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0414 | SAWICKI Jan Victor | 02/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0383 | LEWIS Trevor | 09/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0352 | KUCHNA Darian Marian | 08/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0207 | SCOBLE Richard David | 08/03/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0217 | SNELSON Andrew | 19/03/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0092 | GARDNER Shaun Eric Scanes | 04/07/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0541 | HELMAN Tomasz | 11/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0542 | STEWART Martyn | 29/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |
LD0571 | DOWNING Graham Eric | 04/04/2024 | 01/05/2024 | 30/04/2027 |