27/06/2012, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,27/06/2012, 14:00 |
Present |
19/09/2012, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,19/09/2012, 14:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Ruth Pentney |
19/12/2012, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,19/12/2012, 14:00 |
Present |
20/03/2013, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,20/03/2013, 14:00 |
Present |
19/03/2014, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,19/03/2014, 14:00 |
Present as substitute |
25/06/2014, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,25/06/2014, 14:00 |
Present |
24/09/2014, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,24/09/2014, 14:00 |
Present |
21/01/2015, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,21/01/2015, 14:00 |
Present |
18/03/2015, 14:00 |
Audit Committee ,18/03/2015, 14:00 |
Apologies received |
13/07/2011, 17:30 |
Council ,13/07/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
29/09/2011, 17:30 |
Council ,29/09/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
31/10/2011, 17:30 |
Council ,31/10/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
08/12/2011, 14:00 |
Council ,08/12/2011, 14:00 |
Apologies received |
01/02/2012, 17:30 |
Council ,01/02/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
08/02/2012, 17:30 |
Council ,08/02/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
01/03/2012, 17:30 |
Council ,01/03/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
15/05/2012, 11:00 |
Council ,15/05/2012, 11:00 |
Present |
16/05/2012, 17:30 |
Council ,16/05/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
12/07/2012, 17:30 |
Council ,12/07/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
27/09/2012, 17:30 |
Council ,27/09/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
06/12/2012, 15:00 |
Council ,06/12/2012, 15:00 |
Present |
06/02/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,06/02/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
13/02/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,13/02/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
28/02/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,28/02/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
14/05/2013, 11:00 |
Council ,14/05/2013, 11:00 |
Present |
15/05/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,15/05/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
18/07/2013, 14:00 |
Council ,18/07/2013, 14:00 |
Apologies received |
18/07/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,18/07/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
26/09/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,26/09/2013, 17:30 |
Apologies received |
05/12/2013, 17:30 |
Council ,05/12/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
06/02/2014, 17:30 |
Council ,06/02/2014, 17:30 |
Present |
13/02/2014, 17:30 |
Council ,13/02/2014, 17:30 |
Present |
27/02/2014, 17:30 |
Council ,27/02/2014, 17:30 |
Present |
30/04/2014, 11:00 |
Council ,30/04/2014, 11:00 |
Present |
01/05/2014, 17:30 |
Council ,01/05/2014, 17:30 |
Present |
17/07/2014, 15:00 |
Council ,17/07/2014, 15:00 |
Present |
25/09/2014, 14:00 |
Council ,25/09/2014, 14:00 |
Present |
30/10/2014, 15:00 |
Council ,30/10/2014, 15:00 |
Present |
04/12/2014, 17:30 |
Council ,04/12/2014, 17:30 |
Present |
05/02/2015, 17:30 |
Council ,05/02/2015, 17:30 |
Present |
12/02/2015, 17:30 |
Council ,12/02/2015, 17:30 |
Present |
26/02/2015, 14:00 |
Council ,26/02/2015, 14:00 |
Present |
13/02/2012, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,13/02/2012, 14:00 |
In attendance |
12/03/2012, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,12/03/2012, 14:00 |
Present |
13/01/2014, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,13/01/2014, 14:00 |
In attendance |
10/03/2014, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,10/03/2014, 14:00 |
In attendance |
13/10/2014, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,13/10/2014, 14:00 |
Present as substitute |
10/11/2014, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,10/11/2014, 14:00 |
Apologies, sent representative |
12/01/2015, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,12/01/2015, 14:00 |
Present |
09/02/2015, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,09/02/2015, 14:00 |
Present |
16/03/2015, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,16/03/2015, 14:00 |
Present |
20/04/2015, 14:00 |
Development Management Committee (Note - this committee was replaced by the Planning Committee from 6/5/19) ,20/04/2015, 14:00 |
Present |
26/06/2014, 16:00 |
Health Scrutiny Board ,26/06/2014, 16:00 |
Present as substitute |
28/07/2011, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,28/07/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
09/08/2011, 09:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,09/08/2011, 09:30 |
Present |
26/10/2011, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,26/10/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
16/11/2011, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,16/11/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
14/12/2011, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,14/12/2011, 17:30 |
Present |
13/01/2012, 09:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,13/01/2012, 09:30 |
Present |
13/01/2012, 14:00 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,13/01/2012, 14:00 |
Present |
17/01/2012, 09:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,17/01/2012, 09:30 |
Present |
17/01/2012, 14:00 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,17/01/2012, 14:00 |
Present |
20/01/2012, 09:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,20/01/2012, 09:30 |
Present |
25/01/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,25/01/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
15/02/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,15/02/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
24/04/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,24/04/2012, 17:30 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Jenny Faulkner |
20/06/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,20/06/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
03/07/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,03/07/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
18/07/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,18/07/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
06/08/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,06/08/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
12/09/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,12/09/2012, 17:30 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Ian Doggett |
03/10/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,03/10/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
30/10/2012, 15:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,30/10/2012, 15:30 |
Present |
07/11/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,07/11/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
21/11/2012, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,21/11/2012, 17:30 |
Present |
30/11/2012, 11:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,30/11/2012, 11:30 |
Present |
24/01/2013, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,24/01/2013, 17:30 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
13/03/2013, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,13/03/2013, 17:30 |
Present |
30/04/2013, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,30/04/2013, 17:30 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
10/07/2013, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,10/07/2013, 17:30 |
In attendance |
09/10/2013, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,09/10/2013, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
29/01/2014, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,29/01/2014, 17:30 |
In attendance |
21/05/2014, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,21/05/2014, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
09/07/2014, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,09/07/2014, 17:30 |
Present |
04/09/2014, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,04/09/2014, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
26/11/2014, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,26/11/2014, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
28/01/2015, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,28/01/2015, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
18/02/2015, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,18/02/2015, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
24/02/2015, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,24/02/2015, 17:30 |
Present as substitute |
23/03/2015, 10:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,23/03/2015, 10:30 |
Present as substitute |
08/04/2015, 17:30 |
Overview and Scrutiny Board ,08/04/2015, 17:30 |
Present as substitute; Substituted by Councillor Mark Pountney |
Private meeting, 21/09/2012, 09:30 |
Expected |
Private meeting, 05/10/2012, 10:30 |
Expected |
23/11/2012, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources 2013/2014 Review Panel ,23/11/2012, 09:30 |
Expected |
30/11/2012, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources 2013/2014 Review Panel ,30/11/2012, 09:30 |
Expected |
11/01/2013, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources 2013/2014 Review Panel ,11/01/2013, 09:30 |
Present |
15/01/2013, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources 2013/2014 Review Panel ,15/01/2013, 09:30 |
Present |
16/01/2013, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources 2013/2014 Review Panel ,16/01/2013, 09:30 |
Present |
21/01/2013, 15:00 |
Priorities and Resources 2013/2014 Review Panel ,21/01/2013, 15:00 |
Present |
11/07/2014, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources Review Panel 2015/2016 ,11/07/2014, 09:30 |
Present as substitute |
09/01/2015, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources Review Panel 2015/2016 ,09/01/2015, 09:30 |
Present |
13/01/2015, 09:30 |
Priorities and Resources Review Panel 2015/2016 ,13/01/2015, 09:30 |
Present as substitute |
Private meeting, 19/01/2015, 09:30 |
Present as substitute |
23/04/2015, 09:30 |
Statutory Licensing Sub-Committee ,23/04/2015, 09:30 |
Expected |
17/11/2011, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,17/11/2011, 16:00 |
Present as substitute |
05/01/2012, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,05/01/2012, 16:00 |
Present as substitute |
02/08/2012, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,02/08/2012, 16:00 |
In attendance |
13/09/2012, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,13/09/2012, 16:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
25/10/2012, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,25/10/2012, 16:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
13/12/2012, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,13/12/2012, 16:00 |
Present |
31/01/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,31/01/2013, 16:00 |
Present |
14/03/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,14/03/2013, 16:00 |
Present |
25/04/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,25/04/2013, 16:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
06/06/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,06/06/2013, 16:00 |
Present |
25/07/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,25/07/2013, 16:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
05/09/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,05/09/2013, 16:00 |
Present |
24/10/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,24/10/2013, 16:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Bobbie Davies |
12/12/2013, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,12/12/2013, 16:00 |
Present |
23/01/2014, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,23/01/2014, 16:00 |
Present |
27/03/2014, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,27/03/2014, 16:00 |
Present |
10/07/2014, 15:00 |
Transport Working Party ,10/07/2014, 15:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Cindy Stocks |
27/11/2014, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,27/11/2014, 16:00 |
Present |
15/01/2015, 16:00 |
Transport Working Party ,15/01/2015, 16:00 |
Present |